+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time returned to Rules Comm
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- Substitute recommended by Rules Committee
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 31, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor