+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ uncircled
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (13)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 10, 2016: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 3
March 10, 2016: Senate/ motion to reconsider
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 6
March 10, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 10, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
March 3, 2016: House/ uncircled
March 3, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2016: House/ substituted
March 3, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 1, 2016: House/ circled
February 23, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor