+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 14, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor