+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 5, 2013: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor