+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 29, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Vote
February 22, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor