+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House / Enacting Clause Struck
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Rpt Favorable/Substituted
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor