+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2019: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2019: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor