+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2013: House/ failed
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 3
March 7, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor