+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ uncircled
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ failed
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ motion to reconsider passed
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ lifted from Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2011: House/ failed
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor