+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
March 6, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2019: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2019: House/ circled
February 26, 2019: House/ uncircled
February 26, 2019: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 26, 2019: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 26, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor