+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2015: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2015: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor