+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House / Enacting Clause Struck
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Rpt Favorable/Substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor