+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2006: House/ failed
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 10
February 13, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor