+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
March 4, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 22, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor