+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 6, 2014: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor