+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
Senate Floor Amendment 2
Passed
+ − Votes (11)
March 4, 2021: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
March 4, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
March 4, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2021: Senate/ circled
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2021: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor