+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor