+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor