+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2021: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor