+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 4
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ uncircled
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (9)
March 5, 2018: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 4
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2018: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2018: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 23, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2018: House/ uncircled
February 22, 2018: House/ circled
February 12, 2018: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 7
February 12, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor