+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ place back 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ substituted/placed on Consent
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2007: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Absent: 18
February 26, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 20, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 15, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 12, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor