+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor