+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 3
March 11, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 8, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor