+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/ amend
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Absent: 13
February 29, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor