+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ circled
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
February 4, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
January 26, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2021: House/ uncircled
January 21, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
January 19, 2021: House/ circled
January 19, 2021: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor