+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 11, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 3, 2017: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor