+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 20, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor