+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
March 13, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 12, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 12, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
March 12, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2013: House/ uncircled
March 1, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2013: House/ circled
February 22, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor