+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 20, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor