+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 2, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor