+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 17, 2006: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor