+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor