+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ uncircled
- House/ to Senate
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (11)
February 26, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2021: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 17, 2021: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 17, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 16, 2021: House/ circled
February 10, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor