+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 29, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 29, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
February 22, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor