+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House / Enacting Clause Struck
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm Return to Rules Comm
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor