+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted
- House/ uncircled
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2014: House/ uncircled
February 27, 2014: House/ circled
February 27, 2014: House/ substituted
February 21, 2014: House/ floor amendment
February 10, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor