+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
February 20, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor