+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 31, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 25, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor