+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Rules Committee
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Comm with amends
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 31, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor