+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Passed
Senate Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
March 11, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 6, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
February 26, 2013: House/ floor amendment
February 21, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor