+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 25, 2014: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor