+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 15, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House Signed by Speaker/Enrolled
- House Received from Senate
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/signed by President to House
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/read 3rd
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/place back 2nd
- Senate/motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/received from House
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/recalled by Senate
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/failed
- Senate/from Rules Comm to 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd (Suspension)
- Senate/to House
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
- House Filed
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/received from House
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm Report Favorable
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Received from General Counsel
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2003: Senate/failed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor