+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 3
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2017: House/ floor amendment # 2
March 3, 2017: House/ floor amendment # 3
March 3, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor