+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 18, 2014: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor