+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
- House/ substitute adoption failed from # 2 to # 4
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ substitute adoption failed from # 2 to # 3
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 2
March 25, 2022: House/ substitute adoption failed from # 2 to # 4
March 25, 2022: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
March 25, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
March 25, 2022: Senate/ substitute adoption failed from # 2 to # 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor