+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 21, 2024 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
- Governor Signed
On June 20, 2024 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On June 19, 2024 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On June 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On June 19, 2024 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On June 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On June 19, 2024 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On June 18, 2024 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On June 14, 2024 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2024: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
June 19, 2024: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor