+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ amended in Rules Committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Vote
February 24, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor