+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 3
January 31, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor