+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor