+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
January 31, 2006: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor